Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:41:46 (UTC).

Selina Bravo vs Stoer Construction, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Selina Bravo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Stoer Construction, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2325

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bravo, Selina

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

1800 Holdings, LLC

Stoer Construction, Inc

Cornerstone Community Management

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fletcher, Ram

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Nudelman, Jessica A

Harris, David Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: *continued from 11/06/18*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Harris as to cross complaint filed 9-27-18 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Partial, With Prejudice, as to the Complaint ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons on Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Cross-Complaint - Comment: Atty Nudelman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Answer: Cross Complaint - Comment: Answer to XC of Stoer Construction, Inc. Atty Nudelman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Cross-Complaint - Comment: No Summons issued. Atty: Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer to complaint, atty: Harris.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Answer/Response (No Fee) - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Demand: Jury Trial - Comment: Demand for Jury and Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less