This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 08:23:38 (UTC).

S.B.C.C., INC., vs MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING, INC

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 S B C C , INC , filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING, INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7206

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S.B.C.C., INC.,

Cross Defendants

S.B.C.C., INC. dba south bay construction

BERKELEY CEMENT, INC.

FRESNO PLUMBING & HEATING, INC.

NEW AGE ELECTRIC, INC.

MONUMENT CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Not Yet Classified

MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING, INC

Not Classified By Court

Nancy Wieben Stock

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter V. Dessau

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Kathleen Cheatum Miller

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

11/30/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

11/30/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

3/14/2022 Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

Request: Dismissal

3/8/2022 Request: Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

2/9/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/9/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Cross-Complaint

6/4/2021 Cross-Complaint

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

6/4/2021 Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/4/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Statement: Case Management Conference

6/7/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Declaration

6/10/2021 Declaration

Declaration

6/10/2021 Declaration

Notice

9/22/2021 Notice

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/15/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/15/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Order: Proposed

11/22/2021 Order: Proposed

Minute Order

11/30/2021 Minute Order

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: S.B.C.C., INC.,,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service (Dismissals)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: S.B.C.C., INC.,,; Comment: Request for Dismissal (Dismissals)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Proposed; Filed By: S.B.C.C., INC.,,; Comment: Referee's Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING, INC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: S.B.C.C., INC.,,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Nancy Stock,; Comment: Notice of Disclosures (JAM reference # 1200058856)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Nancy Stock,; Comment: Consent and Certification of Referee (CCP 638 & 639)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Nancy Stock,; Comment: Judicial Referee's Designation of Contact Person: Hanna Ahn 5 Park Plaza Suite 400 Irvine, CA 92614

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: S.B.C.C., INC.,,; Comment: 9-7-21 Declaration of Mark Sandberg ISO Motion for Judicial Reference Under CCP 638 and for Order Appointing Judicial Referee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: S.B.C.C., INC.,,; Comment: 9-7-21 Declaration of Jerri Kroen ISO Motion for Judicial Reference Under CCP 638 and for Order Appointing Judicial Referee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: S.B.C.C., INC.,,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING, INC,; Comment: to Complaint : Atty Miller

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING, INC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING, INC,; Comment: Atty Miller

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: S.B.C.C., INC.,,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: S.B.C.C., INC.,,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: S.B.C.C., INC.,,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less