This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 19:35:25 (UTC).

Satya Chinnusamy vs Kauveyri Rajaraman

Case Summary

On 04/13/2018 Satya Chinnusamy filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Kauveyri Rajaraman. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arroyo, Jacqueline and Hendrickson, Cindy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0292

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arroyo, Jacqueline

Hendrickson, Cindy

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Chinnusamy, Satya

Satya Chinnusamy

Respondents

Rajaraman, Kauveyri

Kauveyri Rajaraman

Minors

Satya, Mekala

Satya, Menaka

Menaka Satya

Mekala Satya

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Scardamaglia, John Edward

John Edward Scardamaglia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Satya Chinnusamy,; Comment: dv-140

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 66; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 66; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: Order: Restraining Order After Hearing; Filed By: Satya Chinnusamy,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Satya Chinnusamy,; Comment: Proof of Service: Personal; HRG 5/16/18; Order on Request to Continue HRG; TRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketDescription: DV Continuance; Filed By: Satya Chinnusamy,; Comment: reiss/f 5/9/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketDescription: DV Continuance; Filed By: Satya Chinnusamy,; Comment: reiss/f 5/9/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketDescription: Request: Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Filed By: Satya Chinnusamy, Kauveyri Rajaraman,; Comment: all granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCARDAMAGLIA, JOHN