This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/09/2018 at 19:28:39 (UTC).

Sarwat Enterprise LLC vs D. Daniel, et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2009 Sarwat Enterprise LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against D Daniel. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Berry, Frank, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6979

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Berry, Frank, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sarwat Enterprise Llc

2419 Basswood

San Ramon, CA 94582

Defendants

David G. Daniel

San Jose, CA 95139

Carlo Ganjeh

San Jose, CA 95125

Mehrdad Dormanesh

Campbell, CA 95008

Dormanesh, Mehrdad

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Dormanesh, Mehrdad; Party: Name: Sarwat Enterprise LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Berry, Frank, Jr.; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Dormanesh, Mehrdad; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Sarwat Enterprise LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Sarwat Enterprise LLC; Judgment Amount: $5,140.50; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $190.00; Other: $4,950.50; Total: $5140.50; Comment: clerkid=382; printdate=Jan 5 2010; freetext=Judgment against defendants Carlo Ganjeh & Mehrdad Dormanesh only, joint & several, for a total judgment amount of $5,140.50. Dismissed in court without prejudice as to defendant David G. Daniel due to bankruptcy.; origjudgdate=Jan 4 2010; judgstatusdate=Jan 5 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Dormanesh, Mehrdad; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Sarwat Enterprise LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Text = Judgment against defendants Carlo Ganjeh & Mehrdad Dormanesh, joint & several, for a total judgment amount of $5,140.50. Dismissed in court without prejudice as to defendant David G. Daniel due to bankruptcy. Result By = C Result Judge = FB - Berry, Frank Result Date = 01/04/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 01/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2009
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = notice of stay of proceedings - bankruptcy filed10/26/09 Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = personal service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = personal service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = personal service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = For Deft. Carlo Ganjeh Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Deft. David G. Daniel Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2009
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = For Deft. Mahrdad Dormanesh Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 10/30/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Addl Plts and Defs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = claim amount $4950.50 Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 10/30/2009

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.