This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 16:59:26 (UTC).

Saritha Thoudoju vs Srikanth Thoudoju

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 Saritha Thoudoju filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Srikanth Thoudoju. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2658

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Saritha Thoudoju

Respondent

Srikanth Thoudoju

Minors

Hrishik Thoudoju

Sruthika Thoudoju

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Moksha Smith

Respondent Attorney

Madan Ahluwalia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Comment: Amended BFA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order After Hearing; Comment: Order (After hearing and Post BFA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Post Mediation Hearing; Department: Department 77; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Post Mediation Hearing; Department: Department 77; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Post Mediation Hearing; Department: Department 77; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Post Mediation Hearing; Department: Department 77; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • HearingDescription: Post Mediation Hearing; Department: Department 77; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Findings & Order After Hearing; Filed By: Saritha Thoudoju,; Comment: 10/6/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: Post Mediation Hearing; Department: Department 77; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Saritha Thoudoju,; Comment: Proof of Service: Personal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Saritha Thoudoju,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Saritha Thoudoju,; Comment: Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Saritha Thoudoju,; Comment: Declaration Re: UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Saritha Thoudoju,; Comment: Income and Expense Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies); Filed By: Saritha Thoudoju,; Comment: c/c, c/v, c/s, s/s

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less