This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 20:26:59 (UTC).

Betlazar, et al. v. Pulte Home Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/01/2016 Betlazar filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Pulte Home Corporation. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirwan, Peter and Walsh, Brian C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3392

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirwan, Peter

Walsh, Brian C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brandon, Illana

Palermo, Thomas

Betlazar, Sargiz

Hannon, Ronald

Kim, Shelly

Aranda, Maria

Rojas, Jose

Arsenous, Ozhen

Palermo, Cassie

Pataky Hannon, Judy

Brandon, Dean

Pataky Hannon, Ronald

Defendant

Pulte Home Corporation

Cross Defendants

Dryco Construction, Inc.

M&B Drywall

Coast Insulation Contractors, Inc.

Cloverleaf Construction, Inc.

Coastal Construction And Lumber Company, Inc.

Kelly Door Company, Inc.

Other

Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jackson, Lee

Hamblin, Lauren A

Other Attorneys

Jeffery, Mona Jane

 

Court Documents

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer Response Denial Demurrer - First Appearance: Comment: Answer to Pulte Home Corporation's Cross-Complaint

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer to XComplaint.pdf: Comment: Answer to Pulte Home Corporation's Cross-Complaint

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Betlazar - Answer to X-Complaint.pdf: Comment: Answer to Pulte Home Corporation's Cross-Complaint

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Dryco Co Answer to Pulte Homes XC: Comment: Answer to Pulte Homes Construction's Cross-Complaint

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

NOTICE OF JURY FEES.pdf: Comment: NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY AND DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

ANSWER CROSS-COMPLAINT.001.pdf: Comment: Largo Conrete, Inc.'s Answer to Pulte Home Corp's Cross-Complaint

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order: Comment: Stipulation & Order re Court Order to Use Electronic Service - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer to Pulte Home Corp.'s Cross-Complaint: Comment: Answer to Pulte Home Corp.'s Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint: Comment: #G-84751 / Atty: Antes

Dismissal

Request for Dismissal: Comment: Dismissal With Prejudice of the Cross-Complaint by Pulte Home Corporation, filed 6/20/16, as to Dryco Construction, Inc. only

Dismissal

Request for Dismissal: Comment: Dismissal With Prejudice of the Cross-Complaint by Pulte Home Corporation, filed 6/20/16, as to Largo Concrete, Inc. only

Dismissal

Dismissal: Comment: Dismissal With Prejudice of Pulte Home Corporation's Cross-Complaint, filed 6/20/16, as to San Marino Plastering, Inc. only

Notice

Notice CMC reset from 3-3-17 to 5-5-17: Comment: CMC reset from 3/3/17 to 5/5/17

Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement Case Management Conference: Comment: Joint

Order

Order Authorizing Service of Western Building Specialties: Comment: Order on Application for Order Authorizing Service of Western Building Specialties by Delivery of Process to Secretary of State - signed by Judge Brian C. Walsh

Application and Order

Application: Comment: Application For Order Authorizing Service Of Summons On Cross-defendant Western Building Special Ties By Delivery Of Process To Secretary Of State And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof; Declaration Of Ryan T. Antes; Declaration Of Ashley Cherradi; [proposed] Order Directing Delivery Of Process To California Secretary Of State

Order

Order Case is Reassigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Hon. Brian C. Walsh

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer to Pulte Cross-Complaint: Comment: Answer to Cross-Complaint of Pulte Home Corporation

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Dismissal Review Hearing --- Discovery stayed, as of 5/2/16 * SM Gerald Kurland * CMO entered 7/28/16 * mediation 2/15/17 and 4/19/17. Notice of Settlement filed 4/3/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice Dismissal Review Hearing 8-25-17: Comment: Dismissal Review Hearing set for 8/25/17 at 10am in D1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT HEARING. Discovery stayed, as of 5/2/16. Settlement Referee is Gerald Kurland; CMO entered 7/28/16; mediation 2/15/17 and 4/19/17. Notice of Settlement filed 4/3/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal - Dismissal: Comment: Partial * Dismissal With Prejudice of Pulte Home Corporation's Cross-Complaint, filed 6/20/16, as to Groundbreakers Landscaping, Inc. only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal - Dismissal: Comment: Partial * Dismissal With Prejudice of the Cross-Complaint filed by Pulte Home Corporation on 6/20/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Statement Case Management Conference:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal - Dismissal: Comment: Partial * Dismissal With Prejudice of Pulte Home Corp's Cross-Complaint (6/20/16) as to Petersen-Dean, Inc. only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal - Dismissal: Comment: Partial * Dismissal With Prejudice of Pulte Home Corp.'s Cross-Complaint (filed 6/20/16) as to WBC only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal - Dismissal: Comment: Partial * Dismissal With Prejudice of Pulte Home Corp.'s Cross-Complaint (Filed 6/20/16) as to Peggy Lane, Inc. dba Cultured Marble Products only

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: #G-84751 / to Complaint, Atty; Antes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: RE Answer - case has been deemed complex, you must e-file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: #G-83309 Dismissal Without Prejudice of the Complaint by Plaintiffs Sargiz Betlazar, Thomas & Cassie Palermo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: #G-83290 - POS of order deeming case complex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Order: Deeming Case Complex - Comment: #G-83235 Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: *and all Plaintiffs*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Complex Litigation: Provisional - Comment: 2,7,8,9,10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kelly Door Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLOVERLEAF CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dryco Construction Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COASTAL CONSTRUCTION & LUMBER COMPANY is a litigant