This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:51:00 (UTC).

Sarah Sauerzopf vs Jessica Smith

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Sarah Sauerzopf filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jessica Smith. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6096

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sauerzopf, Sarah Mallory

Defendant

Smith, Jessica Autumn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abronson, William H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Sauerzopf, Sarah Mallory; Smith, Jessica Autumn; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Full Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Not Held; Comment: Off Calendar -Ntc of Settlement filed on 07/13/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: HRG 7/17/18 Notice: Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less