This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 00:16:18 (UTC).

Sara Lopez vs Raul Lopez

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 Sara Lopez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Raul Lopez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pegg, Lori E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2556

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pegg, Lori E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lopez, Sara Luz

Respondent

Lopez, Raul

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pegg, Lori E; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Lopez, Sara Luz; Lopez, Raul; Lopez, Raul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Response: Dissolution - Comment: Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less