Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:40:40 (UTC).

Sara Estrada vs Jesus Estrada Navarro

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Sara Estrada filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Jesus Estrada Navarro. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weinstein, Joshua. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2979

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Weinstein, Joshua

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Estrada, Sara Lynn

Respondent

Estrada Navarro, Jesus Guillermo

Minor

Estrada, Helena Kamalei

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • Request for Order : Support - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: (P)-cs, compel (R) declaration of disclosures-ct

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Change of Address Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Request for Order (Initial) - Comment: cs, compel (R) dec of disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: FL-120; FL-105; FL-311

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: served fl100, fl110, fl120 fl105, fl160, fl150, fm1050, fm 1021, fl311, fl341, fl341

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (P) separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (P) community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less