This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/03/2022 at 15:52:42 (UTC).

Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union vs J. Eason, et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2010 Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J Eason. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Spalasso, Kenneth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9916

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Spalasso, Kenneth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Jay Eason

Cheryl Eason

Eason, Jay

Eason, Cheryl

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2012
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union, Jay Eason, Cheryl Eason,; Comment: Text = monterey, issued 11/22/11 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Fully Satis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union, Jay Eason, Cheryl Eason,; Comment: Text = costs $ 453.00, credit $ 1,368.23, interest $ 191.33 DOM: 4/11/12 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Comment: Text = monterey 05/17/11 $798.70 deficit Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Partially Satis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Comment: Text = santa cruz 01/05/11 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Unsatis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union,; Comment: Text = costs $276.00, credits $495.46, interest $138.38 dom 10/25/11 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union,; Comment: Text = monterey $1001.15 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union,; Comment: Text = Monterey; $1,104.97 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Unsatis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union,; Comment: Text = Monterey; $1,104.97 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2011
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union, Jay Eason, Cheryl Eason,; Comment: Text = Monterey, $1,104.97 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union,; Comment: Text = costs $110.00, credit $150.00, interest $62.74, mailed 03/01/11 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union,; Comment: Text = Costs $30.00; Credits $150.00; Interest $28.44 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union,; Comment: Text = Santa Cruz, $990.67 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Default; Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union,; Comment: Text = Granted Legacy Name = SC Decl:Default in Payments on Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 58; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Heard: Stipulated judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 08/09/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union, Jay Eason,; Comment: Text = served Jay Eason, by substituted service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union,; Comment: Text = Declaration of Diligence Legacy Name = SC Misc Declaration Decision = M Closed = 06/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union, Cheryl Eason,; Comment: Text = served Cheryl Eason, by personal service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12; Filed By: Santa Clara Couny Federal Credit Union,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 06/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less