This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 22:57:13 (UTC).

Santa Clara County Federal Credit Union vs A. Carrasco

Case Summary

On 01/13/2011 Santa Clara County Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against A Carrasco. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cunningham, Ray E, Flint, Andrea E and Fernandez, Alfonso. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5749

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cunningham, Ray E

Flint, Andrea E

Fernandez, Alfonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santa Clara County Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Alfredo Carrasco

Carrasco, Alfredo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Caudill

1025 North Fourth Street

San Jose, CA 95112-4942

Caudill, Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court (CV); Party: Name: Carrasco, Alfredo; Party: Name: Santa Clara County Federal Credit Union

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Flint, Andrea E; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court (CV); Party: Name: Carrasco, Alfredo; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Santa Clara County Federal Credit Union; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Santa Clara County Federal Credit Union; Judgment Amount: $8,016.01; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Carrasco, Alfredo; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $350.90; Costs: $293.00; Other: $7,372.11; Total: $8016.01; Comment: printdate=Jun 27 2011; freetext=total judgment $8,016.01; origjudgdate=Jun 23 2011; judgstatusdate=Jun 27 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=09LT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Acknow/Satisf of Jgmt Full Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Text = Los Angeles, issued 6/30/11 - deficit $5,981.88 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Partial Satis Decision = M Closed = 02/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Text = no appearances Result By = C Result Judge = AF - Fernandez, Alfonso Result Date = 11/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Text = oex signed (11/26/12) Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appear/Exam of Debtor Decision = M Closed = 09/21/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing); Comment: Text = Alfredo Carrasco (Atty Caudill) Result By = C Result Judge = AF - Fernandez, Alfonso Result Date = 09/17/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Text = oex signed (09/17/12) Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appear/Exam of Debtor Decision = M Closed = 07/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 06/30/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = Los Angeles $8,041.01 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 06/30/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2011
  • Default Not Entered - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = denied: insufficient proof of a contract/debt owed. Legacy Name = CV Default Not Entered Decision = M Closed = 03/25/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • Default Pending - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = file to judge/d109 Legacy Name = CV Default Pending Decision = M Closed = 03/22/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • Declaration: In Support - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = of Navee Madrone of request for Entry of Default & Default Judgment by court Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support Decision = M Closed = 03/22/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = as to defts does I thru XXX, inclusive only. Atty Caudill Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 03/22/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • Request: Enter Default - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = cost - $293.00 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 03/22/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • Declaration: Re: Diligence - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Diligence Decision = M Closed = 03/22/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Text = subserved Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/22/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2011
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K - Judicial Officer: Cunningham, Ray E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAUDILL, THOMAS