This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 18:07:41 (UTC).

Sandy Padua vs Conmed Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 Sandy Padua filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Conmed Corporation. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7492

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandy Padua

Defendant

Conmed Corporation

Not Yet Classified

Ethicon, Inc.

Campbell Surgery Center, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Deon Shaun Goldschmidt

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Kelley Spencer Olah

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/26/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/26/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/20/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/20/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/23/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/10/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 7; Time: 2:15PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Ethicon, Inc.,; Comment: to complaint: atty Olah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Sandy Padua,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Sandy Padua,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Sandy Padua,; Comment: Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Sandy Padua,; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Sandy Padua,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sandy Padua,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conmed, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant