This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 12:29:19 (UTC).

Sandy Cornell vs Taree Newman

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 Sandy Cornell filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Taree Newman. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3561

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sandy Cornell

Respondent

Taree Newman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Melinda Anne Sammis

Respondent Attorney

Shannon Stein

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Taree Newman,; Comment: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Taree Newman,; Comment: Income and Expense Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Sandy Cornell,; Comment: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION (Declarations)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response: Dissolution; Filed By: Taree Newman,; Comment: Response: Dissolution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution no minor; Filed By: Sandy Cornell,; Comment: Petition: Dissolution (Petitions)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sandy Cornell,; Comment: Summons (Summons)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Sandy Cornell,; Comment: Family Law Notice (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less