Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:41:18 (UTC).

SANDVIDIRA LLC vs ANGEL LOPEZ et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by SANDVIDIRA LLC against ANGEL LOPEZ in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2247

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Overton, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDVIDIRA LLC

Defendants

LOPEZ, ANGEL

FLORES, MARIA

Not Yet Classified

All Unnamed Occupants

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court (CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: SANDVIDIRA LLC; Awarded Against: LOPEZ, ANGEL; FLORES, MARIA; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $6,801.31; Attorney Fees: $700.00; Costs: $548.64; Total: $8,049.95; Party: Names: SANDVIDIRA LLC; LOPEZ, ANGEL; FLORES, MARIA; All Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: SANDVIDIRA LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 783 Noranda Drive, Apartment #1 Sunnyvale, CA 94087; Awarded Against: LOPEZ, ANGEL; FLORES, MARIA; Party: Names: SANDVIDIRA LLC; LOPEZ, ANGEL; FLORES, MARIA; All Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: $8049.95, signed by Judge Overton (e-serve 05/02/19 #2836107)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Lost Originals.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Declaration: CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Default Not Entered - Comment: Plaintiff cannot be listed under Item #1.d.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: As of February 2018, all attorneys must efile. Please efile the Request for Default.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Filed) - Comment: issued 8/27/18, satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Issued) - Comment: 783 Noranda Drive, Apartment #1, Sunnyvale, CA 94087

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: No PJC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Request for Order to service/summons by post or publication - Comment: Application for service by publication (by atty Rothbard) is GRANTED, signed Judge Overton.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint-Unlawful Detainer (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less