This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/01/2022 at 02:22:59 (UTC).

Sandra Tellez vs Arnulfo Calderilla

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 Sandra Tellez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Arnulfo Calderilla. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pegg, Lori E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4216

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pegg, Lori E

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Tellez, Sandra Patricia B.

Sandra Patricia B. Tellez

Respondents

Calderilla, Arnulfo Magana

Arnulfo Magana Calderilla

Minors

Magana, Andrew J.

Magana, Arnulfo

Arnulfo Magana

Andrew J. Magana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketDescription: Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336; Filed By: Sandra Tellez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS; Filed By: Sandra Tellez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketDescription: FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Sandra Tellez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Sandra Tellez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Sandra Tellez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Sandra Tellez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Sandra Tellez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Default Custody & Visitation Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketDescription: Returned/Undeliverable Mail; Filed By: Arnulfo Calderilla,; Comment: req to enter default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Comment: SET ASIDE PER ORDER FILED ON 5/23/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Comment: SET ASIDE PER ORDER FILED ON 5/23/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Sandra Tellez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final); Filed By: Sandra Tellez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Sandra Tellez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less