This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:27:24 (UTC).

Sandra Prado et al vs Mossimo Cox et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Sandra Prado filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mossimo Cox. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Steingart, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2554

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Steingart, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Casarez, Adam Ray

Prado, Sandra Abigail

Defendants

Cox, Mossimo Steven

Traveler's Property and Casualty Insurance

Cox, Suzanne Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Comment: Comment (Plaintiff field Request for dismissal With Prejudice); Party: Names: Prado, Sandra Abigail; Casarez, Adam Ray; Cox, Mossimo Steven; Cox, Suzanne Lee; Traveler's Property and Casualty Insurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Fee Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Subpoena for Witness Ms. Mindy V. Bernal to appear.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: POS on SC-107. Served on Mindy V. Brenal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: Granted In Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less