This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/31/2022 at 14:13:56 (UTC).

Sandra Davila vs Jorge Davila

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 Sandra Davila filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Jorge Davila. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2992

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Davila, Sandra B.

Sandra B. Davila

Respondents

Davila, Jorge

Jorge Davila

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336; Filed By: Sandra Davila, Jorge Davila,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS; Filed By: Sandra Davila, Jorge Davila,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Sandra Davila,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Sandra Davila,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Sandra Davila,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Sandra Davila,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Order-Grant; Filed By: Sandra Davila,; Comment: (P) mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Application; Filed By: Sandra Davila,

    Read MoreRead Less