This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/11/2022 at 14:12:38 (UTC).

Sandman, Inc. vs C & C Family Trust, et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2008 Sandman, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against C C Family Trust,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5097

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandman, Inc.

Defendants

C & C Family Trust

Pcdi, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Raymond Chu

Chao Chien Chang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2009
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Satisfaction; Filed By: Sandman, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Acknowledge Satisfaction of Jgmt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Heard: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Raymond Chu,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Chao Chang,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2008
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2008
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12; Filed By: Sandman, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 04/25/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2008
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Sandman, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Fictitious Business Name Decision = M Closed = 02/15/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sandman, Inc. is a litigant