This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 09:44:07 (UTC).

Sanchez v. The Posh Bakery Inc. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Sanchez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against The Posh Bakery Inc Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9732

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Silvia Sanchez

Defendant

The Posh Bakery Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas J. Ferraro

Defendant Attorneys

Roger Mark Mason

Kurt Edward Wilson

Rachael Elizabeth Brown

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Order: Deeming Case Complex

1/10/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/10/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/10/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/1/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/1/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Notice

2/21/2023 Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: The Posh Bakery Inc. ,; Comment: Notice of Representation + Complex Fee paid by The Posh Bakery Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Silvia Sanchez,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Silvia Sanchez,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Silvia Sanchez,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Silvia Sanchez,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Silvia Sanchez,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less