This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/29/2022 at 11:18:27 (UTC).

San Jose Sharks LLC, et al. v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company, et al.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 San Jose Sharks LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Factory Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3780

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

San Jose Sharks LLC

Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC

Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, LLC

IceArizona Holdings LLC

Delaware North Companies, Inc.

Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc.

Hockey Western New York, LLC

DCP HH LLC, Dallas Sports & Entertainment, L.P.

Sunrise Sports & Entertainment LLC

Minnesota Hockey Ventures Group, LP

Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc.

Predators Holdings LLC

Mid-Ice LLC

Devils Holdco LP

NY Hockey Holdings LLC

Harbor Yard Sports & Entertainment, LLC

Capital Sports Holdings Inc.

SLB Acquisition LLC, Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd.

Aquilini Investment Group Limited Partnership

Black Knight Sports and Entertainment LLC

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rani Gupta

Other Attorneys

Larry Hecimovich

Jonathan Rian Gross

Susan Rebecca Sullivan

G David Rubin

David Richard Simonton

Chet Alan Kronenberg

Brett Charles Safford

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Motion: Strike

5/3/2022 Motion: Strike

Demurrer

5/3/2022 Demurrer

Declaration: In Support

5/3/2022 Declaration: In Support

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

5/3/2022 Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Notice

4/29/2022 Notice

Notice

4/29/2022 Notice

Stipulation and Order

4/28/2022 Stipulation and Order

Motion: Leave

1/26/2022 Motion: Leave

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

3/30/2022 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Proof of Service

5/3/2022 Proof of Service

Proof of Service

4/28/2022 Proof of Service

Statement: Case Management Conference

2/18/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service

2/18/2022 Proof of Service

Notice

2/17/2022 Notice

Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

2/14/2022 Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Proof of Service

2/14/2022 Proof of Service

Notice

2/9/2022 Notice

Proof of Service

2/9/2022 Proof of Service

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Demurrer and Motion to Strike; Department: Department 1; Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion: Strike; Filed By: Factory Mutual Insurance Company,; Comment: HRG 7/7/22 Factory Mutual's Motion to Strike Portions of the Second Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Demurrer; Filed By: Factory Mutual Insurance Company,; Comment: HRG 7/7/22 Factory Mutual's Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: Factory Mutual Insurance Company,; Comment: HRG 7/7/22 Memo of P&A ISO Demurrer and Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Factory Mutual Insurance Company,; Comment: HRG 7/7/22 Isaac Rethy Declaration ISO Demurrer and Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Factory Mutual Insurance Company,; Comment: HRG 7/7/22 Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC reset from 6/23/22 to 7/28/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC reset from 7/28/22 to 8/4/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Factory Mutual Insurance Company,; Comment: Stipulation & Order Regarding Defendant's Response to the Second Amended Complaint - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: San Jose Sharks LLC, Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC, Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, LLC, IceArizona Holdings LLC, Delaware North Companies, Inc., Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc., Hockey Western New York, LLC, DCP HH LLC, Dallas Sports & Entertainment, L.P., Sunrise Sports & Entertainment LLC, Minnesota Hockey Ventures Group, LP, Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc., Predators Holdings LLC, Mid-Ice LLC, Devils Holdco LP, NY Hockey Holdings LLC, Harbor Yard Sports & Entertainment, LLC, Capital Sports Holdings Inc., SLB Acquisition LLC, Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Aquilini Investment Group Limited Partnership, Black Knight Sports and Entertainment LLC, Megill-Stephenson Company Limited, Osmington Inc., National Hockey League, NHL Enterprises, L.P, NHL Enterprises Canada, L.P., NHL Enterprises B.V, Rani Gupta,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: San Jose Sharks LLC, Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC, Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, LLC, IceArizona Holdings LLC, Delaware North Companies, Inc., Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc., Hockey Western New York, LLC, DCP HH LLC, Dallas Sports & Entertainment, L.P., Sunrise Sports & Entertainment LLC, Minnesota Hockey Ventures Group, LP, Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc., Predators Holdings LLC, Mid-Ice LLC, Devils Holdco LP, NY Hockey Holdings LLC, Harbor Yard Sports & Entertainment, LLC, Capital Sports Holdings Inc., SLB Acquisition LLC, Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Aquilini Investment Group Limited Partnership, Black Knight Sports and Entertainment LLC, Megill-Stephenson Company Limited, Osmington Inc., National Hockey League, NHL Enterprises, L.P, NHL Enterprises Canada, L.P., NHL Enterprises B.V, Rani Gupta,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: San Jose Sharks LLC, Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC, Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, LLC, IceArizona Holdings LLC, Delaware North Companies, Inc., Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc., Hockey Western New York, LLC, DCP HH LLC, Dallas Sports & Entertainment, L.P., Sunrise Sports & Entertainment LLC, Minnesota Hockey Ventures Group, LP, Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc., Predators Holdings LLC, Mid-Ice LLC, Devils Holdco LP, NY Hockey Holdings LLC, Harbor Yard Sports & Entertainment, LLC, Capital Sports Holdings Inc., SLB Acquisition LLC, Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Aquilini Investment Group Limited Partnership, Black Knight Sports and Entertainment LLC, Megill-Stephenson Company Limited, Osmington Inc., National Hockey League, NHL Enterprises, L.P, NHL Enterprises Canada, L.P., NHL Enterprises B.V, Rani Gupta,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: San Jose Sharks LLC, Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC, Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, LLC, IceArizona Holdings LLC, Delaware North Companies, Inc., Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc., Hockey Western New York, LLC, DCP HH LLC, Dallas Sports & Entertainment, L.P., Sunrise Sports & Entertainment LLC, Minnesota Hockey Ventures Group, LP, Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc., Predators Holdings LLC, Mid-Ice LLC, Devils Holdco LP, NY Hockey Holdings LLC, Harbor Yard Sports & Entertainment, LLC, Capital Sports Holdings Inc., SLB Acquisition LLC, Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Aquilini Investment Group Limited Partnership, Black Knight Sports and Entertainment LLC, Megill-Stephenson Company Limited, Osmington Inc., National Hockey League, NHL Enterprises, L.P, NHL Enterprises Canada, L.P., NHL Enterprises B.V, Rani Gupta,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: San Jose Sharks LLC, Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC, Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, LLC, IceArizona Holdings LLC, Delaware North Companies, Inc., Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc., Hockey Western New York, LLC, DCP HH LLC, Dallas Sports & Entertainment, L.P., Sunrise Sports & Entertainment LLC, Minnesota Hockey Ventures Group, LP, Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc., Predators Holdings LLC, Mid-Ice LLC, Devils Holdco LP, NY Hockey Holdings LLC, Harbor Yard Sports & Entertainment, LLC, Capital Sports Holdings Inc., SLB Acquisition LLC, Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Aquilini Investment Group Limited Partnership, Black Knight Sports and Entertainment LLC, Megill-Stephenson Company Limited, Osmington Inc., National Hockey League, NHL Enterprises, L.P, NHL Enterprises Canada, L.P., NHL Enterprises B.V,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: San Jose Sharks LLC, Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC, Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, LLC, IceArizona Holdings LLC, Delaware North Companies, Inc., Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc., Hockey Western New York, LLC, DCP HH LLC, Dallas Sports & Entertainment, L.P., Sunrise Sports & Entertainment LLC, Minnesota Hockey Ventures Group, LP, Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc., Predators Holdings LLC, Mid-Ice LLC, Devils Holdco LP, NY Hockey Holdings LLC, Harbor Yard Sports & Entertainment, LLC, Capital Sports Holdings Inc., SLB Acquisition LLC, Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Aquilini Investment Group Limited Partnership, Black Knight Sports and Entertainment LLC, Megill-Stephenson Company Limited, Osmington Inc., National Hockey League, NHL Enterprises, L.P, NHL Enterprises Canada, L.P., NHL Enterprises B.V,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: San Jose Sharks LLC, Sharks Sports & Entertainment LLC, Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, LLC, IceArizona Holdings LLC, Delaware North Companies, Inc., Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc., Hockey Western New York, LLC, DCP HH LLC, Dallas Sports & Entertainment, L.P., Sunrise Sports & Entertainment LLC, Minnesota Hockey Ventures Group, LP, Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc., Predators Holdings LLC, Mid-Ice LLC, Devils Holdco LP, NY Hockey Holdings LLC, Harbor Yard Sports & Entertainment, LLC, Capital Sports Holdings Inc., SLB Acquisition LLC, Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Aquilini Investment Group Limited Partnership, Black Knight Sports and Entertainment LLC, Megill-Stephenson Company Limited, Osmington Inc., National Hockey League, NHL Enterprises, L.P, NHL Enterprises Canada, L.P., NHL Enterprises B.V,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 10/21/21 at 2:30pm D1; assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni pending complexity review

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunrise Sports & Entertainment LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where DELAWARE NORTH COMPANIES INCORPORATED is a litigant