This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 12:48:40 (UTC).

San Bruno 925, LLC et al vs Jorge Sanchez et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 San Bruno 925, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jorge Sanchez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Manoukian, Socrates P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0511

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Manoukian, Socrates P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Bruno 925, LLC

Defendants

Jones, Wendell J.

Chacho's, Inc.

Sanchez, Jorge

Chacho's SF, Inc.

Chacho's

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooper, James Sherman

Defendant Attorney

Camarena, Ignascio G., II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketHearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: By Def Wendell Jones. Def's failure to appear by result in answer being stricken.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of OSC re Defendants' Failure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDefault Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: General Denial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons on First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOPER JAMES SHERMAN