This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 08:42:35 (UTC).

Sameer Rao vs Zycada Networks, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2016 Sameer Rao filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Zycada Networks, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Folan, Maureen A, Kirwan, Peter and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4280

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Folan, Maureen A

Kirwan, Peter

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rao, Sameer

Sameer Rao

Defendants

Zycada Networks, Inc.

Antonyraj, Roy

Varadarajan, Subramanian

Subramanian Varadarajan

Roy Antonyraj

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stebbins, Michael William

VanNiekerk, Marc George

Michael William Stebbins

Marc G. VanNiekerk

Defendant Attorneys

Bulut, Koray J.

James K. Bulut

Jennings, Noah

Noah Jennings

 

Court Documents

Request: Dismissal

6/11/2018 Request: Dismissal

Minute Order

3/29/2018 Minute Order

Stipulation and Order: ADR

1/11/2018 Stipulation and Order: ADR

Minute Order

9/20/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

9/19/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

6/6/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

4/18/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

4/18/2017 Minute Order

Conference: Further Case Management

9/19/2017 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

9/19/2017 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

9/19/2017 Conference: Further Case Management

Review: Mediation Status

3/29/2018 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

3/29/2018 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

3/29/2018 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

3/29/2018 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

3/29/2018 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

3/29/2018 Review: Mediation Status

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Sameer Rao,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Mediation Status; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketDescription: Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order: ADR; Filed By: Zycada Networks, Inc.,; Comment: Appointed Hon. Kevin Murphy (Ret.) as Mediator; Session held on 3-15-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketDescription: Answer/Response (No Fee); Filed By: Zycada Networks, Inc., Subramanian Varadarajan, Roy Antonyraj,; Comment: Answer to third amended complaint. Atty Jennings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketDescription: Complaint: Amended; Filed By: Sameer Rao, Zycada Networks, Inc., Subramanian Varadarajan, Roy Antonyraj,; Comment: third amended complaint *no summons issued*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketDescription: Order: Ex Parte; Comment: re: ex parte proposed order after hearing - The Court already prepared, signed and mailed order on 9-19-17 - signed by Judge Folan *see order for details*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketDescription: Application and Order: Ex Parte; Filed By: Sameer Rao,; Comment: *order after hrg - to sustain in part demurrer to SAC (Michael W. Stebbins)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Sameer Rao, Zycada Networks, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Sameer Rao, Zycada Networks, Inc.,; Comment: Granted Extend to 3-10-17 Respond to Complaint (Signed by Judge Folan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketDescription: First Paper Filed - Fee; Filed By: Zycada Networks, Inc.,; Comment: Stip Extended to 3-10-17 Respond to Complaint (Signed by Judge Folan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Sameer Rao, Zycada Networks, Inc., Subramanian Varadarajan, Roy Antonyraj,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Michael Stebbins, Sameer Rao, Zycada Networks, Inc., Subramanian Varadarajan, Roy Antonyraj,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Michael Stebbins, Sameer Rao, Zycada Networks, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNINGS, NOAH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BULUT KORAY JAMES