This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/21/2021 at 05:11:20 (UTC).

Salena Durham Vs. Sungil Lee, et al.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2016 Salena Durham filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sungil Lee,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3608

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salena Durham

Cross Plaintiff

The City of San Jose

Cross Defendants

Sungil Lee

Jennifer C.F. Chen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W Pritchard

Cross Defendant Attorney

John Burke

 

Court Documents

Conference: Trial Setting

2/27/2018 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

2/27/2018 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

2/27/2018 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

2/27/2018 Conference: Trial Setting

Review: Mediation Status

11/9/2017 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

11/9/2017 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

11/9/2017 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

11/9/2017 Review: Mediation Status

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

11/3/2016 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

11/3/2016 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

11/3/2016 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

11/3/2016 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

Minute Order

8/15/2016 Minute Order

Minute Order

3/7/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

3/7/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

8/10/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

8/10/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

11/9/2017 Minute Order

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: The City of San Jose,; Comment: Summary- Total Costs: $4153.37

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Salena Durham,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: The City of San Jose,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: The City of San Jose,; Comment: re: 8-23-18 MSJ - GRANTED by Judge Stoelker *see order for details*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Salena Durham,; Comment: Partial, With Prejudice, as to the Complaint ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Salena Durham,; Comment: 9/24/18, Dept. 13 Notice of Settlement Of Entire Case (Quinn)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Motion Summary Judgment; Department: Department 13; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: The City of San Jose,; Comment: HRG 8/23/18 - Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Opposition/Objections; Filed By: The City of San Jose,; Comment: HRG 8/23/18 - Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Sungil Lee, Jennifer Chen,; Comment: to complaint: Atty Burke

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Sungil Lee, Jennifer Chen, The City of San Jose,; Comment: Atty Doyle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: The City of San Jose,; Comment: Atty Doyle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:15PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Robin Quinn, Salena Durham,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less