This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:49:40 (UTC).

Safe Products for Californians, LLC vs Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Safe Products for Californians, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5862

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Safe Products for Californians, LLC

Defendants

Amazon.com, Inc

Lucky Vitamin, LLC

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Wal-Mart, Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moore, Tanya Eugene

Defendant Attorneys

Oberst, Brett Howard

Chatow, Mark Everett

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: *continued from 06/04/19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to complaint, Atty Chatow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to complaint, Chatow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: (En# 2954846) RE: Answer to Complaint - First appearance fees of $435 are due for each defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: *continued from 01/15/19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement 6/4/19 10am D19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement 1/15/19 3pm D19

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt - Comment: against: Lucky Vitamin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: POS Re FAC on Atty for Amazon.com,Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Old: Mission Law New: Moore Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint. Atty Oberst

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: to 1st Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: 1st Amended Complaint , atty: Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt - Comment: Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt Re Amazon.com, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less