This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 07:01:11 (UTC).

Safe Products for Californians, LLC vs The Natural Citizen LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Safe Products for Californians, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against The Natural Citizen LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5860

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Safe Products for Californians, LLC

Defendants

SF Markets, LLC

The Natural Citizen LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moore, Tanya Eugene

Defendant Attorneys

Kim, Shirley B

Margulies, Jeffrey Brian

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: For Settlement by Plt Safe Products (Tanya Moore)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Moore as to def SF Markets LLC only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: ***PENDING***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: HRG 04/18/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Affidavit - Comment: HRG 04/18/19 - RE: Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: HRG 04/18/19 - OF TANYA E. MOORE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities - Comment: HRG 04/18/19 - IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: Atty Moore, 4/18/19, 9am, D2 - AND MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 1/15/19 Case Management Statement by Defendant SF Markets, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Notice: Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Answer/Response (No Fee) - Comment: to complaint: atty Kim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: Continue SF Markets, LLC'S Deadline To Respond to Complaint, signed by Judge Zayner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint RE The Natural Citizen LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint Re SF Markets, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less