This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:49:30 (UTC).

Safe Products for Californians, LLC vs Amazon.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Safe Products for Californians, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5859

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Safe Products for Californians, LLC

Defendant

Amazon.com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moore, Tanya Eugene

Defendant Attorney

Oberst, Brett Howard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Safe Products for Californians, LLC; Amazon.com, Inc.; Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: *continued from 01/15/19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement 1/15/19 3pm D19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Old: Mission Law New: Moore Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint. Atty Oberst

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt - Comment: against: Amazon.com Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less