This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 02:10:09 (UTC).

S. Yo, et al vs The Jam Limited Partnerships:PAV-JAM, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2011 S Yo filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against The Jam Limited Partnerships PAV-JAM, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7809

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shih-Jye Yo

Sunnyvale, CA 94087

Ching-Fang Wu

Sunnyvale, CA 94087

Wu, Ching-Fang

Yo, Shih-Jye

Defendants

The Jam Limited Partnerships:Pav-Jam, Llc

575 E Remington Dr #1G

Sunnyvale, CA 94087

Pavlina, Stephen J, Jr.

Remington Grove Apartments

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Pavlina, Stephen J, Jr.; Party: Name: The Jam Limited Partnerships:PAV-JAM, LLC; Party: Name: Wu, Ching-Fang; Party: Name: Yo, Shih-Jye

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: The Jam Limited Partnerships:PAV-JAM, LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Wu, Ching-Fang; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Yo, Shih-Jye; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Wu, Ching-Fang; Awarded Against: The Jam Limited Partnerships:PAV-JAM, LLC; Comment: printdate=Mar 22 2011; freetext=plaintiff's do not owe defendent any money on defendent's claim.; origjudgdate=Mar 21 2011; judgstatusdate=Mar 22 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: The Jam Limited Partnerships:PAV-JAM, LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Wu, Ching-Fang; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Yo, Shih-Jye; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: The Jam Limited Partnerships:PAV-JAM, LLC; Awarded Against: Yo, Shih-Jye; Comment: printdate=Mar 22 2011; freetext=defendent does not owe plaintiffs any money on plaintiff's claim.; origjudgdate=Mar 21 2011; judgstatusdate=Mar 22 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: The Jam Limited Partnerships:PAV-JAM, LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Wu, Ching-Fang; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Yo, Shih-Jye; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 03/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Fictitious Business Name Decision = M Closed = 02/17/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Defendant's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Defendant Claim $0-$1500 Decision = M Closed = 02/17/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 02/14/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 03/22/2011

    Read MoreRead Less