This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2022 at 05:24:02 (UTC).

S. Torres vs K. MacNally

Case Summary

On 08/19/2008 S Torres filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against K MacNally. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0073

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Selene Torres

Defendant

Kevin MacNally

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2009
  • DocketDescription: Abstract of Judgment: Issued; Filed By: Selene Torres, Kevin MacNally,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Abstract of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 10/08/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • HearingDescription: Trial De Novo; Department: Department 13; Time: 8:45AM; Result: Dismissed: Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • HearingDescription: Trial De Novo; Department: Department 5; Time: 8:45AM; Result: Continued: Future Month

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2009
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of Resched SC Trial Decision = M Closed = 07/20/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 06/10/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appeal (Small Claims); Filed By: Kevin MacNally,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing; Filed By: Selene Torres,; Comment: Text = Notice of Filing of Appeal and Notice of Appeal Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DocketDescription: Document: Other; Filed By: Selene Torres,; Comment: Text = reciept for record,plaintiff picked up exhibits Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 58; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Heard: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2008
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: Kevin MacNally,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 12/09/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Kevin MacNally,; Comment: Text = cod - pers serv Selene Torres Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 58; Time: 6:00PM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • DocketDescription: Defendant's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000; Filed By: Kevin MacNally,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Defendant Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 10/14/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Selene Torres, Kevin MacNally,; Comment: Text = personal service of plaintiff's claim to Kevin MacNally, dba: Carrera Millwork, Inc. Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2008
  • DocketDescription: Request: Postponement (Small Claims); Filed By: Kevin MacNally,; Comment: Text = Received less then 10 day prior to the hearing. Request attached to file to be review by Commissioner at time of hearing. Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2008
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing; Filed By: Selene Torres, Kevin MacNally,; Comment: Text = Defendant's Request for Continuance was received less than 10 days before the court date. There is not sufficient time to review your request and notify both parties. Your request will be submitted with the file at the court hearing. IF YOU ARE NOT PRESENT AT THE HEARING: if your request is granted, you will be notified by mail; if your request is denied, the case may be heard as a default in your absence. Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2008
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing; Filed By: Selene Torres, Kevin MacNally,; Comment: Text = **We are returning Defendant's Request for Continuance because the $10.00 fee (pursuant to CCP 116.570(d)) for filing a Request for Continuance was not submitted. **We are returning Defendant's Request for Continuance because your continuance request did not specify that a copy was sent to the opposing party. A copy of your Request for Continuance must be sent to all opposing parties and be received by the Court at least 10 days prior to the court date. **We are returning Defendant's Request for Continuance because form is incomplete: Item #3a is missing date of mailing, name and address mailed to. Date of signature at bottom of form is missing. **Date of hearing stated in item #2a is incorrect. As of the date on this form, hearing is currently scheduled for 10-14-08 @ 6:00 p.m. in Dept. 58. Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2008
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2008
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000; Filed By: Selene Torres,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 08/19/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less