This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 03:22:30 (UTC).

S. Soto Sanchez vs H. Branner

Case Summary

On 03/23/2009 S Soto Sanchez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against H Branner. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Saldivar, Gregory H and Yep, Steven L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3569

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Saldivar, Gregory H

Yep, Steven L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Silvestre Soto Sanchez

San Jose, CA 95122

Soto Sanchez, Silvestre

Defendants

Henry Branner, Jr.

San Jose, CA 95116

Mayfair Auto Wreckers

Branner, Henry, Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Branner, Henry, Jr.; Party: Name: Soto Sanchez, Silvestre

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Branner, Henry, Jr.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Soto Sanchez, Silvestre; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Soto Sanchez, Silvestre; Judgment Amount: $1,224.25; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Branner, Henry, Jr.; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $150.00; Other: $1,074.25; Total: $1224.25; Comment: clerkid=382; printdate=Nov 16 2009; freetext=Default judgment. Defendant shall pay plaintiff a total judgment amount of 1,224.25; origjudgdate=Nov 2 2009; judgstatusdate=Nov 16 2009; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Branner, Henry, Jr.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Soto Sanchez, Silvestre; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Soto Sanchez, Silvestre; Judgment Amount: $1,224.25; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Branner, Henry, Jr.; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $150.00; Other: $1,074.25; Total: $1224.25; Comment: clerkid=382; printdate=Aug 3 2009; origjudgdate=Jul 20 2009; judgstatusdate=Aug 3 2009; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Branner, Henry, Jr.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Soto Sanchez, Silvestre; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Saldivar, Gregory H; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Text = default judgment for plaintiff for a total of $1,224.25 Result By = C Result Judge = GHS - Saldivar, Gregory Result Date = 11/02/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2009
  • SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment - Original Type: SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment; Judicial Officer: Saldivar, Gregory H; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard: Granted; Comment: Text = mtn granted, judgment set aside; hrng set 11/2/09 Result By = C Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 09/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • Certificate of Mailing - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Mailed Notice of Motion to Vacate to Pltf. Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • Motion: Set Aside/Vacate (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc:Mtn to Vacate Jgmt/Decl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Saldivar, Gregory H; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 07/20/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = S Result Judge = DMS - Sutton, Dean Result Date = 06/01/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 06/05/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Personal service; pos on sc-100, NTL. Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2009
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 03/24/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = $1,074.25 refund for engine 12/08 Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $0-$1500 Decision = M Closed = 03/24/2009

    Read MoreRead Less