This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 01:41:31 (UTC).

S. Hoffman vs M. Velo, et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2010 S Hoffman filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against M Velo. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7254

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steven D Hoffman

Cupertino, CA 95014

Hoffman, Steven D

Defendants

Marietta Velo

Monterey, CA 93940

Redentor O. Dinglasan

Milpitas, CA 95035

Velo, Marietta

Dinglasan, Redentor O.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Dinglasan, Redentor O.; Party: Name: Velo, Marietta; Party: Name: Hoffman, Steven D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Dinglasan, Redentor O.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Velo, Marietta; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Hoffman, Steven D; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Hoffman, Steven D; Judgment Amount: $3,073.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Velo, Marietta; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $70.00; Other: $3,003.00; Total: $3073.00; Comment: printdate=Aug 20 2010; origjudgdate=Aug 19 2010; judgstatusdate=Aug 20 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Dinglasan, Redentor O.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Velo, Marietta; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Hoffman, Steven D; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:45 PM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 07/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam Closed = 08/01/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2010
  • SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment - Original Type: SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 10/07/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • Motion: Set Aside/Vacate (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc:Mtn to Vacate Jgmt/Decl Closed = 10/07/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 08/19/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Vacated; set in error; Comment: Result By = C Result Date = 06/23/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 06/23/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 06/23/2010

    Read MoreRead Less