This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/06/2022 at 11:59:17 (UTC).

S. Brassfield vs P. Elias, et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2015 S Brassfield filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against P Elias. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Elfving, William J, Pierce, Mark H, Stoelker, James L, Strickland, Elizabeth, Kulkarni, Sunil R, Zayner, Theodore C and Takaichi, Drew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6106

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Elfving, William J

Pierce, Mark H

Stoelker, James L

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Zayner, Theodore C

Takaichi, Drew C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shann M. Brassfield

Brassfield, Shann M.

Defendants, Not Yet Classified and Cross Defendants

Paul S.S. Elias

Oscar J. Vega, Jr.

Apec Construction

Vega, Oscar J., Jr.

O J V Construction

Elias, Paul S.S.

ASAP Appliance Service, Inc.

Cross Plaintiffs, Not Classified By Court, Cross Defendants and Defendants

Apec Construction

Hillside Drywall

Elias, Paul S.S.

Vega, Oscar J., Jr.

O J V Construction

Cross Defendants, Not Classified By Court and Defendants

Rasp, James W. P.E.

Apec Construction

Ivary Management Company

Vega, Oscar J., Jr.

O J V Construction

Hillside Drywall

Elias, Paul S.S.

ASAP Applicance Service, Inc. dba ASAP Appliance Service & Plumbing

Bidabadi, Joe B., P.E.

Paragon Design Group, Inc.

ADCO Engineering

Daggers Painting Co.

Monarca Roofing

Modern Day Flooring

ASAP Appliance Service, Inc.

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Paul S.S. Elias

Hillside Drywall

Special Master

Bellagamba, Robert A.

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James D. Farwell

18 Park Avenue

Los Gatos, CA 95030

James Dumeresq Farwell

Stephen Horner

Farwell, James D.

Horner, Stephen

Cross Plaintiff, Not Classified By Court, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Acree, Marissa N

Arneal, Richard G.

Chatowski, John Alexander

Dove, Mark Stephen

Selvin, Gary Robert

Schaffer, Todd Allen

Mocsny, Connor Andrew

Trudeau, J. Fred

Sims, Bobby Dale, Jr.

Rodman, Jordan Allen

Guggenheim, Richard R.

Tillman, Patrick Kevin

Other Attorneys

Arakawa, Gregory Patrick

McCaffery, Timothy James

Gagliasso, Robert Mario

 

Court Documents

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

4/29/2021 Hearing: Dismissal after settlement

Order

5/3/2021 Order

Minute Order

4/29/2021 Minute Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/24/2015 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/24/2015 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/24/2015 Summons: Issued/Filed

339 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Shann Brassfield,; Comment: As the result of the Dismissal After Settlement hearing, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice, signed Judge Rudy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 7; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 7; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Oscar Vega, Serafin Trejo,; Comment: Granting appl for Good Faith Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil); Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: Shann Brassfield,; Comment: NOE - Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Comment: Env.#5577616; Cross complaint filed on 9/14/2016 by atty. Schaffer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Shann Brassfield,; Comment: Complaint; (Still Pending cross complaints 9/14/16)

    Read MoreRead Less
404 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: Paul Elias,; Comment: in Suppt of Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketDescription: Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day; Filed By: Paul Elias,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketDescription: Motion: Strike; Filed By: Paul Elias,; Comment: ntc of motion and motion to strike portions of plt's complaint; 12/17/15 at 9am, dept 3; atty Acree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: Paul Elias,; Comment: in Suppt of Mtn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Shann Brassfield,; Comment: Oscar J. Vega dba O J V Construction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Shann Brassfield, Paul Elias,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Shann Brassfield, Paul Elias, Oscar Vega,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Shann Brassfield, Paul Elias, Oscar Vega,; Comment: Atty Farwell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Shann Brassfield, Paul Elias, Oscar Vega,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where O J V Construction is a litigant

Latest cases where Ivary Management Company dba Renaissance Stone Care & Waterproofing is a litigant

Latest cases where dba Hillside Drywall is a litigant

Latest cases where APEC Construction is a litigant