This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 02:14:59 (UTC).

S. Anderson, et al vs M. Belmonte, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2014 S Anderson filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against M Belmonte. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C, Elfving, William J, Strickland, Elizabeth and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8055

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Elfving, William J

Strickland, Elizabeth

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sean Anderson

Katherine Anderson

Anderson, Katherine

Anderson, Sean

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Michelle Belmonte

American Financial Network, Inc.

Ruby Ann Foote

Nrt West, Inc.

Belmonte, Michelle

Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage

Foote, Ruby Ann

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Nrt West, Inc.

Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric A. Gravink

1960 The Alameda, Suite 200

San Jose, CA 95126

Gravink, Eric A.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

La Cues, Brett

Davidson, Michael W.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Davidson, Michael W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2016
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: C/F 8/11/16 10am per D-6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Dismissal - Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Davidson as to cross-complaint filed 11-19-15 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: PARTIAL w/prej as to the Complaint ONLY (Eric A. Gravink)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Est. 5 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Conference: Settlement - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: entire/unconditional (Eric A. Gravink)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Statement: Settlement Conference - Comment: 5/11/16 @ 1:30pm D6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2014
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = Taken on Motion to Strike PLT's Request for Atty Fees from Complaint - Atty Cues Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd Decision = M Closed = 08/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = Atty Davidson Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 08/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Acknowledgement - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = Atty Eric A. Gravink Legacy Name = CV Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Acknowledgement - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = Atty Eric A. Gravink Legacy Name = CV Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 07/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 07/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 07/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less