This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:48:54 (UTC).

Ryan Ledbetter et al vs Lenna El Safwany

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Ryan Ledbetter filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Lenna El Safwany. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Copeland, Christine, Lin, Wen-Ching, Pierce, Mark H and Steingart, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3560

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Copeland, Christine

Lin, Wen-Ching

Pierce, Mark H

Steingart, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ledbetter, Ryan

Ledbetter, Qwanita

Defendants

El-Safwany, Lenna

El-Safwany, Mounir

El-Safwany, Jacqueline

El Safwany, Mounir

El Safwany, Jacqueline

El Safwany, Lenna

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Ledbetter, Ryan; Ledbetter, Qwanita; Judgment Amount: $3,989.00; Awarded Against: El Safwany, Lenna; Amount; Damages: $3,744.00; Costs: $245.00; Total: $3989.00; Comment: Joint & Several; Party: Names: Ledbetter, Ryan; El Safwany, Lenna; Ledbetter, Qwanita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lin, Wen-Ching; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Ledbetter, Ryan; Ledbetter, Qwanita; Awarded Against: El Safwany, Lenna; Amount; Damages: $5,975.88; Costs: $370.00; Total: $6345.88; Comment: Judgement is joint/several; Party: Names: Ledbetter, Ryan; El Safwany, Lenna; Ledbetter, Qwanita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Notice of Appeal of Small Claims Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $75.00. Con 't from 09/18/18 by Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Con 't from 08/13/18 by Court. Motion to Vacate is Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) - Comment: SC-150 Request to Postpone Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim (Amended) (No change in no claim amount) - Comment: Failure to reimburse security deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $75.00.- No POS as of 05/09/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Order - Comment: SMALL CLAIMS ORDER: Plaintiff shall amend the Claim, then re-set and serve. The Claim needs to be amended because: Plaintiff/Tenant Qwanita Ledbetter needs to be added as a party (doesn't have to appear, but has to be added). Commissioner Copeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Comment: Failure to reimnurse lease deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less