This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 22:15:48 (UTC).

Ruddy Vs Community Hospital

Case Summary

On 08/21/2008 Ruddy filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Community Hospital. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Overton, Carol, Cabrinha, Neal A, Kleinberg, James P, Strickland, Elizabeth and Lucas, Patricia M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0687

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Overton, Carol

Cabrinha, Neal A

Kleinberg, James P

Strickland, Elizabeth

Lucas, Patricia M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paul Ruddy

William M. Ruddy

Karl Ruddy

Ruddy, Karl

Ruddy, Paul

Ruddy, William M.

Defendants

Community Hospital Of Los Gatos, Inc.

Tenet Healthcare Corporation

Edward Kolfas

Mohammad Tavakol

Samia Botros

American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc.

Edward Klofas

Gordon Levin

Tavakol, Mohammad, MD

American Medical Response

Botros, Samia, MD

Levin, Gordon, MD

Community Hospital Of Los Gatos

Kolfas, Edward, MD

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Owen J. Singer

152 North Third Street, Suite 800

San Jose, CA 95112

Singer, Owen J.

Defendant Attorneys

Craig S. Dummit

11755 Wilshire Blvd, 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025-1506

Dummit, Craig S.

James M. Nelson

201 North Civic Drive, Suite 239

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-3879

Katherine A Parish

1676 N. California Blvd., Suite 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-4183

Barry C. Marsh

12901 Saratoga Avenue

Saratoga, CA 95070

Marsh, Barry C.

Bradford J. Hinshaw

12901 Saratoga Avenue

Saratoga, CA 95070

Nelson, James M.

Parish, Katherine A

Hinshaw, Bradford J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Levin, Gordon, MD; Party: Name: Klofas, Edward, MD; Party: Name: Tavakol, Mohammad, MD; Party: Name: Kolfas, Edward, MD; Party: Name: Tenet Healthcare Corporation; Party: Name: Community Hospital Of Los Gatos, Inc.; Party: Name: Ruddy, Karl; Party: Name: Ruddy, William M.; Party: Name: Ruddy, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Botros, Samia, MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Original Type: Jury Trial: Long Cause; Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed; Comment: Text = Est. 15 days *Per Fax Copy of Dismissal* Result By = C Result Judge = PML - Lucas, Patricia Result Date = 07/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Original Type: Conference: Settlement Jury; Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed; Comment: Text = *Per Fax Copy of Dismissal* Result By = C Result Judge = PML - Lucas, Patricia Result Date = 07/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Text = by atty Owen Singer Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 07/14/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 07/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Text = complaint as to deft Samia Botros, M.D. ONLY. (Owen J. Singer) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 07/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • Jury Fee Deposit - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Text = $150 paid Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • Jury Fee Deposit - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Comment: Text = $150 paid Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2008
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2008
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Comment: Text = on first amended complaint Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 09/15/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Comment: Text = on first amended complaint Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 09/15/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Comment: Text = on first amended complaint Legacy Name = CV Summons Issued Decision = M Closed = 09/15/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • Complaint: Amended - Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Comment: Text = (Atty Singer) Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Complaint Decision = M Closed = 09/15/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2008
  • Acknowledgement - Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Comment: Text = summons & complt, civil case coversheet, civil lawsuit ntc, ADR info sheet. Legacy Name = CV Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 09/05/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2008
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2008
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2008
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Tenet Health Care Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NELSON, JAMES M.