This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:59:19 (UTC).

Rowena Kelly v Essex Portfolio, L.P., et al.

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Rowena Kelly filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Essex Portfolio, L P . This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arand, Mary E and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1849

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arand, Mary E

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly, Rowena

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Essex Portfolio, L.P

J.R. Roberts/Deacon Inc.

Balco, Inc.

Deacon Construction, LLC

Moes 1 though 25

Roes 1 through 25

LDI Mechanical

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ritigstein, Eric Scott

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Bustamante, Robert Maurice

Reyes, Von Ryan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: Session w/Matt Conant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Answer/Response (No Fee) - Comment: Answer/Response/Denial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Envelope #03163915, the defendant's name on the title of the answer to cross-complaint does not match the name on court records. Confirmed w/ atty's assistant Lisa on 8/1/2019 @ 11:08am, will resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Original Type: Review: Mediation Status; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Session w/Matt Conant 6/19/19 9:30am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fee deposited by atty Ritigstein for plaintiff Rowena Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Cross-Complaint - Comment: Cross Action/Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer of Essex Portfolio LP to Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less