This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 10/19/2020 at 06:34:02 (UTC).

Rosaura Guzman vs Yesica Curiel-Guzman

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Rosaura Guzman filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against Yesica Curiel-Guzman. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Johnson, Erik S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0123

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Johnson, Erik S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guzman, Rosaura

Defendant

Curiel-Guzman, Yesica Yajaira

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lopez, Beatriz E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause: RO EA - Judicial Officer: Johnson, Erik S; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Granted - POS Filed 10-5-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketRequest and Order: TRO Elder Abuse (EA-110) - Comment: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice: Court Hearing TRO Elder Abuse (EA-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration: In Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRequest: Order to Stop Elder Abuse (EA-100)

    Read MoreRead Less