This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 11:05:51 (UTC).

Ronald J. Chiri and Regina M. Chiri

Case Summary

On 07/13/2009 Ronald J Chiri and Regina M Chiri was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0116

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ronald J Chiri

Respondent

Regina M Chiri

Not Classified By Court

Chiri Accountancy Corporation Profit Sharing Plan

Chiri Accountancy Corporation 401K Plan In The Name Of Rengina M. Chiri

Chiri Accountancy Corporation 401K Plan In The Name Of Ronald J Chiri

Minors

Adam J Chiri

Emily J Chiri

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2013
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed By: Regina Chiri,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Withdrawal of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed By: Ronald Chiri,; Comment: Text = w/pos Legacy Name = FL Withdrawal of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 03/06/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • DocketDescription: Order: Qualified Domestic Relations; Filed By: Ronald Chiri, Regina Chiri,; Comment: Text = re chiri accountancy corp salary deferral plan Legacy Name = FL QDRO Decision = M Closed = 12/18/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • DocketDescription: Order: Qualified Domestic Relations; Filed By: Ronald Chiri, Regina Chiri,; Comment: Text = re chiri accountancy corp salary deferral plan Legacy Name = FL QDRO Decision = M Closed = 12/18/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Ronald Chiri,; Comment: Text = jgmt; appearance, stip and waivers; dec for default disso (Daniel Walter) Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 09/19/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Default/DS/LS; Filed By: Ronald Chiri,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 09/12/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336; Filed By: Ronald Chiri,; Comment: Text = RESERVED ISSUES Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/FL2336 Decl Decision = G Closed = 09/12/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family); Filed By: Ronald Chiri,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt/Cert of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 09/12/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketDescription: Appearance Stipulation & Waiver; Filed By: Regina Chiri,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Appear/Stip/Waiver Decision = M Closed = 09/12/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • DocketDescription: FC 2336 Packet Received for Review; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = G Closed = 09/12/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Regina Chiri,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Regina Chiri,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • DocketDescription: OSC: Custody/Child Support/Visitation; Filed By: Regina Chiri,; Comment: Text = (r) spousal support, atty fees gj. Legacy Name = FL OSC:Custody/Visit/Child Supt Decision = E Closed = 09/14/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Case Status; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Case Management Conf Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Ronald Chiri,; Comment: Text = /lgm Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/13/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Ronald Chiri,; Comment: Text = /lgm Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 07/13/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Ronald Chiri,; Comment: Text = /lgm Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 07/13/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Ronald Chiri,; Comment: Text = /lgm Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 07/13/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Case Status; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Case Management Conf Decision = M Closed = 07/13/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less