Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:30:36 (UTC).

Roger Winslow, III vs April Winslow

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Roger Winslow, III filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against April Winslow. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3038

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Winslow, Roger, III

Respondent

Winslow, April

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Giacchetti, James Paul

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Winslow, Roger, III; Winslow, April

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Comment: 1-16-2019. Granted. Sent to the Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt - Comment: petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Comment: Petition: Dissolution no minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less