This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 14:54:38 (UTC).

Roger M. Wilcox and Heather M. Wilcox

Case Summary

On 03/19/2014 Roger M Wilcox and Heather M Wilcox was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin and Pennypacker, Philip H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2135

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roger M. Wilcox

Petitioner

Wilcox, Roger M.

Defendant

Heather M. Wilcox

Respondent

Wilcox, Heather M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John S. Yohanan

333 West Santa Clara St., Suite 620

San Jose, CA 95113

Respondent Attorney

Huey, Jessica L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Name: Wilcox, Heather M.; Party: Name: Wilcox, Roger M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Fee Waiver -R 06-12-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Application and Order: Ex Parte - Comment: restore former name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Vacated; Comment: Text = psstc; Resp. filed 6-12-14..sb; c/f 7-8-14 mins, ry; c/f 10-28-14 per S/O filed 10-27-14..sb; c/f 1-28-15 due to matrix change, notice sent, hlo; c/f 1-28-15 per S/O filed 1-26-15..sb Result By = C Result Judge = PHP - Pennypacker, Philip Result Date = 03/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Roger M. Wilcox and Heather M. Wilcox

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt/Cert of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/FL2336 Decl Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Declaration: Default/DS/LS - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Appear/Stip/Waiver Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = (R) fw denied pending hrg for $ 435.00 Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = D Closed = 06/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Notice: Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = re: Resp. to Ptn Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 04/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: Bulk Scan 03-19-14 to 07-22-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 03/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 03/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less