This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 12:51:13 (UTC).

Rocky Sharma vs Stephanie De Le Faverie et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 Rocky Sharma filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Stephanie De Le Faverie. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8066

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rocky Sharma

Defendants

Stephanie De Le Faverie

Spencer G. Smul

Tracey T. Travis

Cora Tan

M.A.C. Cosmetics Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gavril T. Gabriel

Defendant Attorney

Angela Quiles Nevarez

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/1/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

12/1/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/1/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/29/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/20/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/25/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Request: Dismissal

2/2/2023 Request: Dismissal

Stipulation and Order

2/22/2023 Stipulation and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 10; Time: 3:45PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: M.A.C. Cosmetics Inc., ,; Comment: Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint is GRANTED, signed Judge Chung [Env# 11255639]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Rocky Sharma,; Comment: PARTIAL w/o Prej as to Defs Stephanie De Le Faverie, Spencer G. Smul and Tracey T. Travis Only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Rocky Sharma,; Comment: DILIGENCE: Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Rocky Sharma,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Rocky Sharma,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Rocky Sharma,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Rocky Sharma,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Rocky Sharma,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less