This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/22/2022 at 10:53:22 (UTC).

Robin A. Berry and William N. Berry

Case Summary

On 10/16/2009 Robin A Berry and William N Berry was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0253

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robin A Berry

Respondent

William N. Berry

Minors

William Norman Berry

Lindsay Jeanette Berry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Kevin Scott Hutcheson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed By: William Berry,; Comment: Text = (r) w/pos Legacy Name = FL Withdrawal of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 02/22/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Text = Elizabeth Cassell Legacy Name = FL Withdrawal of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 10/20/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Text = atty last name change. Legacy Name = FL Ntc of ... Decision = M Closed = 05/03/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • DocketDescription: Appearance Stipulation & Waiver; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Appear/Stip/Waiver Decision = M Closed = 05/03/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Stip/Waiver:Final Decl of Disclosure Decision = M Closed = 05/03/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • DocketDescription: Child Support Case Registry Form; Filed By: William Berry,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Child Support Case Registry Form Decision = M Closed = 05/03/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • DocketDescription: Child Support Case Registry Form; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Child Support Case Registry Form Decision = M Closed = 05/03/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Default/DS/LS; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 05/03/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • DocketDescription: Miscellaneous: Converted Document; Comment: Robin A. Berry and William N. Berry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • DocketDescription: FC 2336 Packet Received for Review; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SthCo 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = M Closed = 04/19/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Case Status; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Case Management Conf Decision = M Closed = 11/23/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2009
  • DocketDescription: OSC: Modification of Child Support; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Text = spoussal support, property control Legacy Name = FL OSC:Mod Child Support Closed = 01/15/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 11/16/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Case Status; Comment: Text = "N01" set per petition filed Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Case Management Conf Decision = M Closed = 10/16/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 10/16/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Legacy Name = Summons Issued Decision = M Closed = 10/16/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 10/16/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Robin Berry,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 10/16/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hutcheson, Kevin Scott