This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 15:06:11 (UTC).

Roberto S. Garcia and Marissa G. Denson

Case Summary

On 04/14/2015 Roberto S Garcia and Marissa G Denson was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Towery, James E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4407

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Towery, James E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roberto S Garcia

Santa Clara, CA 95050

Petitioner

Garcia, Roberto S

Defendant

Marissa G Denson

Respondent

Denson, Marissa G

Minor

Denson, Valerie Silva

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Garcia, Roberto S; Denson, Marissa G; Denson, Valerie Silva

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: (p)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Declaration for default filed - Comment: (p)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 04/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.