This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:32:40 (UTC).

Robert Sabin vs Kathryn Sabin

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Robert Sabin filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against Kathryn Sabin. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lie, Cynthia C and Weinstein, Joshua. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0211

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lie, Cynthia C

Weinstein, Joshua

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sabin, Robert P.

Claimants

National Elevator Industry Benefit 401(k) & Pension Plans

Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc 401(k) Plan and Pension

Respondent

Sabin, Kathryn H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Pickering, Traci Janeen

Respondent Attorneys

Ahluwalia, Madan

Ehrlich, Mitchell Todd

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Sabin, Robert P.; Sabin, Kathryn H.; Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc 401(k) Plan and Pension; National Elevator Industry Benefit 401(k) & Pension Plans

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: POS Mail; Appearance; Stipulations and Waivers; Stip and Waiver of Final Dec Discl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: Continuance of Review Hearing 4/23/19 to 6/25/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Proof of Service: Electronic - Comment: Stip & Order

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: Declaration Regarding service of Declaration and Income and Expense Declaration-_kathyryn H Sabin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Notice of Intent to Sever Joint Tenancy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Intent to Sever Joint Tenancy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: POS by Mail of Response to Petition for Legal Separation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Response: Legal Separation - Comment: Response to Petition for Legal Separation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition: Legal Separation no minor - Comment: Petition: Legal Separation no minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less