Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 06:44:28 (UTC).

Robert Hasslen vs Sharon Hasslen

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 Robert Hasslen filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against Sharon Hasslen. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hayashi, Roberta S, Cox, James F and Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3682

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hayashi, Roberta S

Cox, James F

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Hasslen, Robert John

Hasslen, Robert

Respondent

Hasslen, Sharon R.

Minor

Hasslen, Genevieve Lily

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sines, John Beesley

Respondent Attorneys

Laughlin, Amy Anne

Frye, Rebekah Atkinson

Holmes, Toriana S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem - Comment: Alisa Young

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: set for TSC per 3/27/19 mins-mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Letter Received - Comment: P-rec'd 4/25/19 from Atty. J. B. Sines-mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Request for Order: Other w/fee - Original Type: Request for Order: Other w/fee; Judicial Officer: Hayashi, Roberta S; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: **$30 reporter fee due prior to hrg**(p) compel rsp to submit to examination by vocational training counselor -th: CF 3/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge - Judicial Officer: Cox, James F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: Re: sale of real prop and dist of sales proceeds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Conference: Status - Judicial Officer: Hayashi, Roberta S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: (p) re: trial setting; set by agreement-pjn

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2017
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Request for Order (Initial) - Comment: (p) c/c, c/v, c/s, s/s, property control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: pos-summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Petition: Legal Separation w/minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Petition: Legal Separation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sines, John Beesley