This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 18:10:12 (UTC).

Robert Boeger Plastering, Inc. vs Roem Builders Incorporated

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 Robert Boeger Plastering, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Roem Builders Incorporated. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2287

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Robert Boeger Plastering, Inc.

Roem Builders Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Edward C. Koons

Andrew Vinson Stearns

 

Court Documents

Review: Mediation Status

1/20/2022 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

1/20/2022 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

9/2/2021 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

9/2/2021 Review: Mediation Status

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/26/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/26/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/15/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Cross-Complaint

9/5/2019 Cross-Complaint

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/5/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/5/2019 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer/Response (No Fee)

10/8/2019 Answer/Response (No Fee)

Minute Order

11/5/2019 Minute Order

Stipulation and Order: ADR

6/24/2021 Stipulation and Order: ADR

Statement: Case Management Conference

8/18/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

8/30/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

9/2/2021 Minute Order

Stipulation and Order: ADR

10/29/2021 Stipulation and Order: ADR

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Mediation Status; Department: Department 7; Time: 10:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order: ADR; Filed By: Roem Builders Incorporated,; Comment: GRANTED; ADR Status Review hearing to remain as set on 1-20-22 at 10:30 AM in Dept. 7, signed Judge Rudy. [Env# 7569887]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Mediation Status; Department: Department 7; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Robert Boeger Plastering, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Roem Builders Incorporated,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order: ADR; Filed By: Robert Boeger Plastering, Inc.,; Comment: Granted; ADR Status Review hearing is continued to 9-02-21 at 10:30 AM in Dept. 7, signed Judge Rudy. [Env# 6718082]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 7; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Referral: Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer/Response (No Fee); Filed By: Robert Boeger Plastering, Inc.,; Comment: to Cross-Complaint, atty Koons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Roem Builders Incorporated,; Comment: ATTY STEARNS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Roem Builders Incorporated,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Roem Builders Incorporated,; Comment: TO COMPLAINT : ATTY STEARNS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Robert Boeger Plastering, Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Robert Boeger Plastering, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Robert Boeger Plastering, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Robert Boeger Plastering, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roem Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward C Koons

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stearns, Andrew Vinson