Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 15:00:34 (UTC).

Robert Anderson vs Nirmal Sajjan

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 Robert Anderson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Nirmal Sajjan. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1445

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anderson, Robert

Defendant

Sajjan, Nirmal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brelsford, William Larry, Jr.

Defendant Attorney

Joost, William E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Anderson, Robert; Sajjan, Nirmal; Comment: entire w/prej (William L. Brelsford)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Appointed David J. Samuelson as Mediator; Session held on 2-15-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Stipulation and Order: ADR - Comment: Appointed David J. Samuelson as Mediator; Session held on 2-15-18 (Signed by Judge Zayner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: *C/F 7/20/17*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: w/pos attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve - Original Type: OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: To complaint; Atty William E. Joost, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer(s): Stoelker, James L, Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 4:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOOST WILLIAM E. JR.