This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 09:45:44 (UTC).

Rico v. FMA Landscape Services, Inc., et al. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Rico filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FMA Landscape Services, Inc , Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9762

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Manuel Nino Rico

Defendants

F M A Landscape Services, Inc.

Miguel A. Medina

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Kirk Donnelly

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/10/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/10/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

1/10/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order: Deeming Case Complex

1/11/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/19/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Juan Nino Rico,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Juan Nino Rico,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice * 1st CMC set for 5/17/23 at 2:30pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Juan Nino Rico,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Juan Nino Rico,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less