This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:04:22 (UTC).

Richard Wilmer et al vs CEM Builders, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 Richard Wilmer filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CEM Builders, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Arand, Mary E and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5458

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Wilmer, Richard "Rick"

Reeves, Ann

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Tucker Engineering

Louis & Associates, Inc

JELD-WEN, Inc

Clore, Rodney

Burling Enterprises, Inc

Clore Sheetmental

Guy's Heating, Air Conditioning and Sheetmental

Oliveira Plastering, Lathing & Drywall, Inc

Old Republic Surety Company

McDonald Concrete Construction, Inc

Unique Stone Setters

Fidelity Roof Company

Rossi, David

Argonaut Window & Door Inc

Blaze Fireplaces of Northern California Inc

Developers Surety and Indemnity Company

Pacific Coast Builders & Remodelers, Inc

CEM Builders, Inc

Wilmer, Richard "Rick"

Reeves, Ann

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

Oliveira Plastering, Lathing & Drywall, Inc

Unique Stone Setters

Blaze Fireplaces of Northern California Inc

Pacific Coast Builders & Remodelers, Inc

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Miller, Michael C.

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawley, Elizabeth Wardrop

Sieving, Richard Norman

Lynch, Jack Donald

Schaffer, Todd Allen

Burrow, Lance

Cody, Kevin P.

Townsend, Kasey Covert

Sims, Bobby Dale, Jr.

Lamond, Christian Fitzgerald

Reyes, Von Ryan

Miller, Michael C.

Gentile, Gregory M

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Lynch, Jack Donald

Burrow, Lance

Reyes, Von Ryan

Other Attorneys

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

Menekshe, Ayhan M

Lagman-Legaspi, Catherine

 

Court Documents

Order

Order Continuing CMC from 7-23-19 to 10-29-19: Comment: Order Continuing CMC from 7/23/19 to 10/29/19 - signed/TCZ

Order

Order Continuing CMC from 4-16-19 to 7-23-19: Comment: Order Continuing CMC from 4/16/19 to 7/23/19 - signed/MHP

Order

Order Vacating 4-25-19 CMC: Comment: Order Vacating 4/25/19 CMC in Case No. 2013-1-CV-239825 - signed/MHP

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: Set per 7/15/19 Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Proposed Order Cover SHeet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Set per 3/29/19 Order. CONTINUED to 10/29/19, by Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: env #03145183- proposed order- Please attach your proposed order to the Proposed Order Cover Sheet for judge's review and signature.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Declaration of Todd A. Schaffer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Application: Good Faith Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: env #03112501-appl for good faith settlement- This filing requires a filing fee of $60. Please attach proper fees and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Continuing CMC from 7-23-19 to 10-29-19: Comment: Order Continuing CMC from 7/23/19 to 10/29/19 - signed/TCZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: **PARTIAL** McDonald Concrete Construction, Inc.'s Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2017
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint Atty Cody

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: *on cross complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Cross-Complaint - Comment: Atty Lynch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer to complaint. Atty Lynch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: For cross-complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Cross-Complaint - Comment: Atty Lawley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: To complaint; Atty Lawley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLAZE FIREPLACES OF NORTHER CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where JELD-WEN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant