This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 16:34:47 (UTC).

RFI Security Inc. vs Winokur Financial Group

Case Summary

On 10/20/2010 RFI Security Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Winokur Financial Group. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steingart, Lisa, Mackin McCarthy, Kristine and Triplett, John R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1782

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steingart, Lisa

Mackin McCarthy, Kristine

Triplett, John R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rfi Security Inc.

360 Turtle Creek Court

San Jose, CA 95125

Defendant

Winokur Financial Group

3131 Bascom Ave Ste 210

Campbell, CA 95009

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Winokur Financial Group; Party: Name: RFI Security Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Triplett, John R; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Winokur Financial Group; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: RFI Security Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: RFI Security Inc.; Judgment Amount: $2,615.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Winokur Financial Group; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $115.00; Other: $2,500.00; Total: $2615.00; Comment: clerkid=355; printdate=Dec 7 2010; origjudgdate=Dec 6 2010; judgstatusdate=Dec 7 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Winokur Financial Group; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: RFI Security Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Document: Other - Comment: JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S REQUEST FOR FUNDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Mackin McCarthy, Kristine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Debtor Sworn; Comment: Text = BW OEX reference case # 7-10-SC-041781 Result By = C Result Judge = KMM - McCarthy, Kristine Result Date = 05/09/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 05/10/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • Certificate of Mailing - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Small Claims Case Notice; Notice of Change of Location for your 5/09/11 hearing. Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = personal service; pos on BW Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2011
  • Warrant: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Eric Winlkur; $1,000.00 bail; ponied to SC Sheriff. Legacy Name = SC Bench Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Bench warrant order issued; Comment: Text = Bench Warrant Ordered For Eric Winokur $1,000.00 bail. Cash Bail Self Only. Cash Bail With Authorization To Apply. No Cite/No Release Result By = C Result Judge = KMM - McCarthy, Kristine Result Date = 02/28/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 02/28/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = served OEX Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Produce Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JRT - Triplett, John Result Date = 12/06/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 12/07/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = attached POS by mail Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc by Sub Service Decision = M Closed = 11/04/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 10/20/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 10/20/2010

    Read MoreRead Less