This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2022 at 01:01:50 (UTC).

Reza Neil et al vs Cinch Home Service Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Reza Neil filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Cinch Home Service Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7210

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Reza Neil

Ozma Neil

Defendants

Cinch Home Service Inc.

Sears Roebuck and Co.

Homesure Protection of California Inc.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

5/2/2022 Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

Proof of Service

5/13/2022 Proof of Service

Proof of Service

5/13/2022 Proof of Service

Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed

5/26/2022 Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 15; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed; Filed By: Reza Neil, Ozma Neil, Sears Roebuck and Co.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Reza Neil, Ozma Neil, Cinch Home Service Inc.,; Comment: Cert Mail. Hrg: 07/11/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Reza Neil, Ozma Neil, Homesure Protection of California Inc.,; Comment: Cert Mail. Hrg: 07/11/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant; Filed By: Reza Neil, Cinch Home Service Inc.,; Comment: 7021 0950 0001 6705 3497

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant; Filed By: Reza Neil, Homesure Protection of California Inc.,; Comment: 7021 0950 0001 6705 3596

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant; Filed By: Reza Neil, Sears Roebuck and Co.,; Comment: 7021 0950 0001 6705 3503

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOMESURE PROTECTION OF CALIFORNIA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cinch Home Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SEARS ROEBUCK & COMPANY is a litigant